EP2032951 - CAPACITIVE LEVEL MEASURING APPARATUS FOR BULK MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mesima Messtechnik Andreas Pfister Ernst-Bihl-Str. 5 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [2018/20] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Delox Messtechnik GmbH Friedrich-List-Strasse 9 71364 Winnenden / DE | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Pfister, Andreas Enzianweg 10 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Andreas Enzianweg 10 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Raible Deissler Lehmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/11] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07764653.7 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007EP05267 | Priority number, date | DE20062009381U | 14.06.2006 Original published format: DE 202006009381 U | [2009/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144180 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032951 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032951 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
G01F23/268 (EP);
G01F23/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVE FÜLLSTANDSMESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHÜTTGÜTER | [2009/11] | English: | CAPACITIVE LEVEL MEASURING APPARATUS FOR BULK MATERIALS | [2009/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE NIVEAU CAPACITIF POUR PRODUITS EN VRAC | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2017 | 12.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2007 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | AT | 14.06.2018 | IE | 14.06.2018 | LU | 14.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | FR | 23.07.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | GB | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.06.2007 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.06.2007 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GB | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1276076 (ELECTRONIQUE ET AUTOMATION) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1503317 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 86 - line 98; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3006425 (GEFI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0310761 (BERWIND CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * column 2, line 27 - line 33 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 35; figures 1-5 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 14; figure 6 *; | [Y]US4987776 (KOON TERRY D [US]) [Y] 11* column 10, line 47 - column 11, line 42; figures 4,7A,7B,7C * |