EP2029169 - RECOMBINANT VIRAL VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSGENE S.A. Boulevard Gonthier d'Andernach Parc d'Innovation, CS80166 67405 Illkirch Graffenstaden Cedex / FR | [2010/14] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states TRANSGENE S.A. 11, rue de Molsheim 67082 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNEFOY, Jean-Yves 29, rue Finkwiller F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
PAUL, Stéphane 27, rue Bautain F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07764675.0 | 15.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007EP05303 | Priority number, date | EP20060360028 | 20.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06360028 | US20060852964P | 20.10.2006 Original published format: US 852964 P | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007147529 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2029169 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/12, C07K14/005, C12N7/00, A61K39/39 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/275 (KR);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55533 (EP,US);
A61K2039/585 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | A61K39/39, A61K39/285 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | HR | 09.12.2008 | RS | 09.12.2008 | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTER VIRALER IMPFSTOFF | [2009/10] | English: | RECOMBINANT VIRAL VACCINE | [2009/10] | French: | VACCIN VIRAL RECOMBINANT | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0224225 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO03080114 (POWDERJECT RES LTD [GB], et al); | [DA]WO2005018574 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [DX]WO2006042254 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | by applicant | US3854480 | US4452775 | US4675189 | US4689338 | US4929624 | EP0385630 | US5075109 | US5133974 | WO9215672 | WO9417043 | US5407686 | WO9527780 | US5736152 | US6207646 | WO0122972 | WO0224225 | US2003139364 | WO03080114 | US2004076633 | WO2005018574 | US6913752 | WO2006042254 |