EP2035640 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH CONCEALED HINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Manufacturing UK, Ltd. Pentwyn Industrial Estate Cardiff CF23 7XB / GB | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Manufacturing UK, Ltd. Pentwyn Industrial Estate Cardiff CF23 7XB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARNEY, Ian Panasonic Manufacturing UK Ltd Pentwyn Industrial Estate Cardiff CF23 7XB / GB | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
DARNEY, Ian Panasonic Manufacturing UK Ltd Pentwyn Industrial Estate Cardiff CF23 7XB / GB | Representative(s) | Williams, Rhys Nicholas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/17] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Hammonds LLP 7 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YH / GB | ||
Former [2009/12] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Hammonds LLP Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07764803.8 | 22.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP05543 | Priority number, date | GB20060012358 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0612358 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007147626 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2035640 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035640 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/06, E05D7/08 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
E05D3/18 (EP,US);
E05D7/08 (GB);
F25D23/028 (GB);
E05D7/081 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/31 (EP,US);
F25D2323/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT VERSTECKTEM GELENK | [2009/12] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH CONCEALED HINGE | [2009/12] | French: | APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE AVEC ARTICULATION CAMOUFLÉE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 20.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2007 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 22.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2867839 (SQUIRE HERBERT D); | [XY]US3065498 (JOHNSON ROBERT E); | [Y]EP0823830 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]EP1327841 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |