EP2037782 - BREWING APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR MAKING INFUSIONS OR BEVERAGES, PARTICULARLY ESPRESSO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plast 2000 S.r.l. Via Salvanti 81 50041 Calenzano / IT | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSO, Pietro c/o PLAST 2000 S.R.L. VIA SALVANTI, 81 50041 CALENZANO(FIRENZE) / IT | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Guareschi, Antonella, et al Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Via Mazzini 2 43121 Parma / IT | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/13] | Guareschi, Antonella, et al Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Viale Mentana 92/C 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 07764986.1 | 02.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007EP05828 | Priority number, date | IT2006PR00063 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: IT PR20060063 | IT2007PR00035 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: IT PR20070035 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008003441 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037782 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037782 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/56, A47J31/36 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
A47J31/56 (EP,US);
A47J31/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRÜHVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON AUFGÜSSEN ODER GETRÄNKEN, INSBESONDERE ESPRESSO | [2009/13] | English: | BREWING APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR MAKING INFUSIONS OR BEVERAGES, PARTICULARLY ESPRESSO | [2009/13] | French: | APPAREIL D'INFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR OBTENIR DES INFUSIONS OU DES BOISSONS, EN PARTICULIER DES EXPRESSOS | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | FI | 11.08.2010 | HU | 11.08.2010 | LT | 11.08.2010 | LV | 11.08.2010 | MT | 11.08.2010 | PL | 11.08.2010 | RO | 11.08.2010 | SI | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | IS | 11.12.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
MT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
TR | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
MT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0427666 (ESTRO SRL [IT]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 1; figure - *; | [X]DE9309438U (SCHLAIS WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-3* page 5, paragraph 7 - page 16, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [X]EP0934719 (CIMBALI SPA [IT]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0034] - [0051]; figure - *; | [XY]EP1460353 (ILLYCAFFE SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-13,25 * paragraphs [0032] - [0054]; figure - * [Y] 4 |