EP2052140 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FOR GAS AND GASOLINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2018/21] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLADUNG, Oliver Martha-Fuchs-Str. 14 a 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
HAGELSTEIN, Dirk Grabenhorst 64 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
NOODT, Florian Gerstenbreiten 72 38165 Lehre OT Flechtorf / DE | 04 /
POTT, Ekkehard Westring 33 38518 Gifhorn / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2018/21] |
Former [2009/18] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael Reinhardt & Pohlmann Patentanwälte Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 07765124.8 | 07.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007EP06043 | Priority number, date | DE20061037381 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037381 | DE20061049242 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049242 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008017354 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052140 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052140 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02B3/02, F02B37/04, F02B43/00, F02D19/06 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
F02B37/04 (EP);
F02B43/00 (EP);
F02B69/04 (EP);
F02D19/0615 (EP);
F02D19/0647 (EP);
F02D19/0689 (EP);
F02D19/0692 (EP);
F02B17/005 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE FÜR GAS UND BENZIN | [2009/18] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FOR GAS AND GASOLINE | [2009/18] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE POUR GAZ ET ESSENCE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 21.01.2016 | Appeal received No. T1049/16 | 04.04.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 29.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2007 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | AT | 07.07.2018 | IE | 07.07.2018 | LU | 07.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.07.2007 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.07.2007 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.07.2007 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9942718 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,8-12,15-19,21,23,25,26 * pages 24-26; figures 1a,1b *; | [DY]DE10062391 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [DY] 1-3,8-12,15-19,21,23,25,26 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1321658 (PARISI GUIDO [IT]) [A] 1,2,15,16,26* paragraphs [0017] , [0038]; figure 1 * | Examination | JP2005233059 | US2006064981 | EP1846650 |