EP2041031 - STABLE SUSPENSIONS OF CRYSTALLINE TIO2 PARTICLES OF HYDROTHERMALLY TREATED SOL GEL PRECURSOR POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCKMEYER, Matthias St. Benediktstrasse 2 1/2 97072 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
HERBIG, Bettina Waldstrasse 16 97534 Waigolshausen / DE | 03 /
LÖBMANN, Peer Stegerwaldstrasse 12b 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07765177.6 | 11.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP06159 | Priority number, date | DE20061032755 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006032755 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006566 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041031 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/053, C03C17/25, C04B41/50, C04B41/87 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C01G23/053 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J35/60 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/256 (EP,US);
C09C1/3615 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE SUSPENSIONEN VON KRISTALLINEN TIO2-PARTIKELN AUS HYDROTHERMAL BEHANDELTEN SOL-GEL-VORSTUFENPULVERN | [2009/14] | English: | STABLE SUSPENSIONS OF CRYSTALLINE TIO2 PARTICLES OF HYDROTHERMALLY TREATED SOL GEL PRECURSOR POWDERS | [2009/14] | French: | SUSPENSIONS STABLES DE PARTICULES DE TIO2 CRISTALLINES OBTENUES À PARTIR DE PROGÉNITEURS PULVÉRULENTS SOL-GEL TRAITÉS PAR HYDROTHERMIE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 04.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0884320 (IND RES LTD [NZ]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1045815 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006061367 (COLOROBBIA ITALIANA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [DA] - GE, LEI; XU, MINGXIA; E, LEI; TIAN, YUMING; FANG, HAIBO, "Preparation of TiO2 thin films using inorganic peroxo titanic complex and autoclaved sols as precursors", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS (PT. 1, HIGH-PERFORMANCE CERAMICS III), Trans Tech Publications, Switzerland, (2005), vol. 280-283, pages 809 - 812, XP009093964 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - CHENG H ET AL, "HYDROTHERMAL PREPARATION OF UNIFORM NANOSIZE RUTILE AND ANATASE PARTICLES", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19950401), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 663 - 671, XP000513055 [A] 1-28 * Seite 664: Experimental Procedure * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm00052a010 |