EP2029889 - PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRIC POWER FROM THE MOVEMENT OF WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bozano, Enrico Via Nicolò Oderico 4 16145 Genova / IT | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [2017/10] |
Former [2009/10] | Porsia, Attilio c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 07765423.4 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007EP55903 | Priority number, date | IT2006GE00064 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: IT GE20060064 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144407 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029889 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2029889 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/08, F03B13/14, F03B13/18, F04B35/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
F04B35/004 (EP,US);
F03B13/145 (EP,US);
F03B13/147 (EP,US);
F03B13/187 (EP,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP,US);
F05B2250/5011 (EP,US);
Y02E10/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | F03B13/08, F03B13/14, F03B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE AUS WELLENBEWEGUNG | [2009/10] | English: | PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRIC POWER FROM THE MOVEMENT OF WAVES | [2009/10] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE À PARTIR DU MOUVEMENT DES VAGUES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2007 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | GB | 14.06.2017 | IE | 14.06.2017 | LU | 14.06.2017 | MT | 14.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.06.2007 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.06.2007 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4883411 (WINDLE TOM J [US]) [I] 1-9,11,12 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, lines 47-58 * * column 7, lines 17-42 * * figures 1,4 *; | [I]FR530941 (BRUN JOSEPH) [I] 1,8-10 * the whole document * * figures 3,6 *; | [I]US6388342 (VETTERICK SR RICHARD C [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8,9,11-13 * column 1, lines 4-9 * * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1045138 (BERIA CLAUDIO [IT]; BERIA ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1-5,9,12 * the whole document * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB655987 (WAVE POWER DEV LTD) [A] 1,8,10,13 * page 1, lines 39-84 * * page 2, lines 4-115 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US3487228 (KRIEGEL BERNARD) [A] 1-4,8,9,11,12 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2848189 (CALOIA JOHN A) [A] 1-4,9 * the whole document * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2860270 (DIB MAZEN [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * * figure 1 * |