EP2035507 - DYE MIXTURES OF FIBRE-REACTIVE AZO DYES, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Colours Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Dystar Colours Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Industriepark Höchst, Gebäude B 598 65926 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRENBERG, Stefan In den Wiesen 5 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07765428.3 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP55916 | Priority number, date | DE20061028229 | 20.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028229 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007147774 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2035507 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035507 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/44, C09B62/475, C09B62/513, C09B67/22 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
C09B62/513 (EP,KR);
C09B62/44 (KR);
C09B62/4415 (EP);
C09B62/4422 (EP);
C09B62/475 (EP,KR);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
C09B67/0047 (EP);
C09B67/005 (EP);
C09B67/0057 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFMISCHUNGEN VON FASERREAKTIVEN AZOFARBSTOFFEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2009/12] | English: | DYE MIXTURES OF FIBRE-REACTIVE AZO DYES, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2009/12] | French: | MÉLANGES DE COLORANTS AZO RÉAGISSANT AVEC DES FIBRES, PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DESDITS MÉLANGES | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 02.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.12.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/10] | 02.08.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/27] | 01.12.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/27] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | IE | 17.11.2010 | IT | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | MT | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | GB | 14.06.2011 | LU | 14.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
GB | 14.06.2011 | ||
LU | 14.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
GB | 14.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
GB | 14.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0785237 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * Formeln (1) und (2b) * * page 2, lines 3-18 * * page 6, lines 51,52 * * page 9, lines 7-18 * * example 4 * * claims 1,2,5,6,11-13 *; | [A]EP1013720 (DYSTAR TEXTILFARBEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,10 * Formeln (1) und (2) * * compounds (A)-(D) ** claims 1,17 *; | [A]WO03033599 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * Formeln (1aa) und (1ab) * * page 1, paragraphs 1-4 * * claims 1-12 *; | [A]DE10337636 (DYSTAR TEXTILFARBEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2005080508 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * compounds (1)-(8) * * claims 1-11 * |