EP2041526 - DETERMINATION OF A TYPE AND AN AMOUNT OF A MEDICAMENT BY INDUCTIVE MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Jon Ulrich Rybjerg Allé 101 2730 Herlev / DK | 02 /
BERGGREN, Lennart Handskmakaregatan 4 227 36 Lund / SE | [2009/14] | Application number, filing date | 07765670.0 | 27.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP56418 | Priority number, date | EP20060014117 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06014117 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008003625 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041526 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26, A61M5/24, A61J1/06 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61J1/06 (EP,US);
A61J2205/60 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0233 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINER ART UND EINER MENGE EINES MEDIKAMENTS DURCH INDUKTIVE MITTEL | [2009/14] | English: | DETERMINATION OF A TYPE AND AN AMOUNT OF A MEDICAMENT BY INDUCTIVE MEANS | [2009/14] | French: | DETERMINATION D'UN TYPE ET D'UNE QUANTITE DE MEDICAMENT PAR DES MOYENS INDUCTIFS | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 22.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6068615 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US], et al) [X] 1-9,31-33,35 * column 5, lines 7-26 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 15 * * column 9, lines 22-30; figure 2 * [A] 10-30,34; | [Y]WO2006021295 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2002188259 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al) [X] 21-25,28,29 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 * [A] 26,27; | [XA]WO2005111961 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 21-25,28,29 * paragraph [0063]; figures 5,6 * [A] 26,27; | [XA]WO0156635 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [X] 21-25,28,29 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [A] 26,27 | [DY] - INSUK YU ET AL, "Electrodeless measurement of RF dielectric constant and loss", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (19930301), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 344 - 348, XP020065412 [DY] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/4/3/013 |