EP2026940 - USE OF A MATERIAL RESISTANT TO ATTACKS BY WOOD-DESTROYING INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lapeyre 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL KASMI, Silham 3 bis rue des Moissons F-51460 L'epine / FR | 02 /
VACA-GARCIA, Carlos 134, Avenue Jean Rieux Bâtiment A 31500 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
PEYDECASTAING, Jérôme 67, Rue André Vasseur 31200 Toulouse / FR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Colombier, Christian Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Colombier, Christian Département Propriété Industrielle SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 07766121.3 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007FR51354 | Priority number, date | FR20060052016 | 05.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0652016 | [2009/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007141444 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026940 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B27K3/34 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B27K3/346 (EP,US);
B27K3/36 (EP,US);
B27K3/0285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES GEGEN HOLZZERSTÖRENDE INSEKTEN RESISTENTEN MATERIALS | [2009/09] | English: | USE OF A MATERIAL RESISTANT TO ATTACKS BY WOOD-DESTROYING INSECTS | [2009/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU RÉSISTANT AUX ATTAQUES DES INSECTES XYLOPHAGES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2838369 (LAPEYRE [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03049913 (ORGANISATION NATIONALE INTERPR [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 8; example - *; | [A]JPH04259506 | [Y] - DAWSON ET AL, "Reactivity of radiata pine sapwood towards carboxylic acid anhydrides", CHEMABS, (1999), XP002153747 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 44, Database accession no. 1992-360025, XP002416832 & JPH04259506 A 19920916 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |