EP2036940 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, RESIN USING THE SAME, OPTICAL COMPONENT AND COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Mitsuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
USUGI, Shinichi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
NARUSE, Hiroshi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
OTSUJI, Atsuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Mitsuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
USUGI, Shinichi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
NARUSE, Hiroshi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
04 /
OTSUJI, Atsuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Representative(s) | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/12] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07766940.6 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007JP00633 | Priority number, date | JP20060171725 | 21.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006171725 | JP20060171730 | 21.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006171730 | [2009/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007148432 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036940 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036940 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/06, C08G75/08, C07F9/6553, G02B1/04 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C07F9/655327 (EP,KR,US);
C08G75/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07F9/655309 (EP,KR,US);
C08G75/06 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/041 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | C08G75/06, C07F9/6553, G02B1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/31] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HARZ DAMIT, OPTISCHES BAUTEIL UND VERBINDUNG | [2009/12] | English: | POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, RESIN USING THE SAME, OPTICAL COMPONENT AND COMPOUND | [2009/12] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE, RÉSINE L'UTILISANT AINSI QUE COMPOSÉ ET COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2009 | Translation filed | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 22.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3197407 (CYBA HENRYK A) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 25; compound . *; | [X]DE1086712 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-5 * example - *; | [X]GB919813 (BAYER AG) [X] 1,6-9 * claims 1,2,5-7 * | International search | [AP]JP2006169190 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]WO2005095490 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004310001 (HOYA CORP); | [A]JP2003327583 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]JPS59187094 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]US3071594 (EDGAR ENDERS, et al); | [A]US3169974 (KOHN GUSTAVE K) | by applicant | JPH09110979 | JPH11322930 | JP2003327583 | JPH11140046 | JP2005095490 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATION, (2003), pages 595 - 600 |