EP2033678 - POWDER INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9, Kanda-Tsukasa-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | For all designated states Otsuka Techno Corporation 120-1, Aza-Itayashima, Akinokami Seto-cho, Naruto-shi Tokushima 771-0360 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9, Kanda-Tsukasamachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | ||
For all designated states Otsuka Techno Corporation 120-1, Aza-Itayashima, Akinokami Seto-cho, Naruto-shi Tokushima 771-0360 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIBAYASHI, Toru c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 224-18, Ebisuno, Hiraishi Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0182 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Shintaro c/o OTSUKA TECHNO CORPORATION 330, Otsubo, KoniuNaka-cho Naka-gun, Tokushima 771-5209 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Tetsuya c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 224-18, Ebisuno, Hiraishi Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0182 / JP | 04 /
NAKAO, Takaaki c/o OTSUKA TECHNO CORPORATION 330, Otsubo, KoniuNaka-cho Naka-gun, Tokushima 771-5209 / JP | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07767552.8 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007JP62746 | Priority number, date | JP20060176630 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006176630 | [2009/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008001744 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033678 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/06 (KR);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0005 (EP,US);
A61M15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2206/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | PULVERINHALATOR | [2009/11] | English: | POWDER INHALER | [2009/11] | French: | INHALATEUR DE POUDRE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | Translation filed | 11.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5113855 (NEWHOUSE MICHAEL T [CA]) [Y] 1-10 * columns 3-10; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9209322 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* pages 1-9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0518087 (MIAT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5201308 (NEWHOUSE MICHAEL T [CA]) [A] 1-10 * columns 3-10; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US6116239 (VOLGYESI GEORGE [CA]) [A] 1-10 * columns 2-4; figures 3,4 * * columns 5-13 *; | [Y]US6182655 (KELLER MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * columns 3,4,7-18; figures 1-23 *; | [A]US6321747 (DMITROVIC BOSKO [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * columns 2-6; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2002148469 (O'LEARY DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1452198 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] - [0026] - [0115]; figures 1-42 * | International search | [A]JPH03184563 (MIAT SPA); | [A]JPH05200115 (MIAT SPA); | [A]JPH06502784 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al); | [A]JP2000501013 ; | [A]WO2004033010 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5113855 | EP0518087 | US5201308 | US6116239 | US6182655 | US6321747 | US2002148469 | EP1452198 |