EP2041123 - FUSED CYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Correction of patent specification | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUMA, Tsuneo c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | 02 /
NEGORO, Nobuyuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Masayuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | 04 /
ITOU, Masahiro c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | [2012/05] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
YASUMA, Tsuneo c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
NEGORO, Nobuyuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMASHITA, Masayuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
ITOU, Masahiro c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Weber, Thomas Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07767983.5 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007JP63208 | Priority number, date | JP20060177099 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006177099 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008001931 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041123 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041123 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2041123 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | [2013/01] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2041123 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, A61K31/192, A61P3/10 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/192 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | 22.12.2008 | BA | 22.12.2008 | HR | 22.12.2008 | MK | 22.12.2008 | RS | 22.12.2008 | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE CYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2009/14] | English: | FUSED CYCLIC COMPOUNDS | [2009/14] | French: | COMPOSÉS CYCLIQUES CONDENSÉS | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10172951.5 / EP2248812 | EP11194016.9 / EP2431367 | EP13190005.2 / EP2743268 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2012/40] |
Former [2012/39] | LV | 01.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005063729 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * examples 78,99,100,113,114 *; | [A]EP1559422 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005087710 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [DY]EP1630152 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [DY] 1-18 * examples 50-62,69-72 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0235] , [0334] * [Y] 19; | [PA]EP1698624 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [PA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP1726580 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [PY] 1-18 * examples 250-253 *; | [PA]EP1731505 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [PA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A] - TRALDI, O.; ET AL., ORGANIC MASS SPECTROMETRY, (1985), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 53 - 57, XP002460665 [A] 18,19 * page 54; examples 1-4,d,and,e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/oms.1210200112 | [Y] - CUI X, BURGESS K, "Catalytic homogeneous asymmetric hydrogenations of largely unfunctionalized alkenes", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., (2005), vol. 105, no. 9, pages 3272 - 3296, XP002535915 [Y] 19 * the whole document * * in particular section 6.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CR0500131 | [Y] - BARBARO P ET AL, "Progress in stereoselective catalysis by metal complexes with chiral ferrocenyl phosphines", COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041201), vol. 248, no. 21-24, ISSN 0010-8545, pages 2131 - 2150, XP004917423 [Y] 19 * section 2.1.1, in particular equation (10) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2004.03.022 | [Y] - BURK M J, "Modular phospholane ligands in asymmetric catalysis", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH., ACS, WASHINGTON, DC., (2000), vol. 33, no. 6, pages 363 - 372, XP002535916 [Y] 19 * the whole document * * in particular figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AR990085C |