EP2052430 - FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIYOHIRO, Yukihiko c/o HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07768459.5 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007JP64530 | Priority number, date | JP20060221618 | 15.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006221618 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020533 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052430 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052430 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/24 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP);
H01M8/0271 (US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M8/2457 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP,US);
H01M8/249 (EP,US);
H01M2250/10 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/021 (EP,US);
H01M8/0213 (EP,US);
Y02B90/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2009/18] | English: | FUEL CELL | [2009/18] | French: | PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.08.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | MT | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | GB | 18.07.2011 | IE | 18.07.2011 | LU | 18.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6410178 (MATSUKAWA MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * column 10, line 56 - line 64; figures 6,8 *; | [XY]EP1422774 (SUMITOMO PREC PRODUCTS COMPANY [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0044]; figures 2A,2B,3 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0052]; figure 6a * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US2005118491 (RAMSEY JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 4,5* paragraph [0023]; figures 2B,3B *; | [PX]WO2007077723 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,6-12 * figures 2,3,5,7 *; | [PX]WO2007077724 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,6-12 * figures 2,3,5,7 * |