EP2038695 - CONTACT LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Procornea Holding B.V. Kollergang 9 6961 LZ Eerbeek / NL | [2012/02] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Procornea Nederland B.V. Kollergang 9 6961 LZ Eerbeek / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANDERS, Bernardus Franciscus Maria Villa Bertha 12 NL-6986 AH Angerlo / NL | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/13] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07768921.4 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007NL50339 | Priority number, date | EP20060116967 | 11.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06116967 | US20060484361 | 11.07.2006 Original published format: US 484361 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007955 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2038695 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
G02C7/041 (EP);
G02C7/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | KONTAKTLINSE | [2009/13] | English: | CONTACT LENS | [2009/13] | French: | LENTILLE DE CONTACT | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6626534 (DIMARTINO ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-16 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO8907281 (NEWMAN STEVE [AU]; PHILLIPS ANTHONY [AU]) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9222845 (NEWMAN, STEVE) [DA] 1-16 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9716760 (PROCORNEA HOLDING B.V; WANDERS, BERNARDUS, FRANCISCUS, MARIA) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2004011989 (NOVARTIS AG; NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH; LINDACHER, JOSEPH, MICHAEL; HALL, J) [DA] 1-16 * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 1 * |