EP2175820 - URINE ABSORBENT POUCH FOR MALE INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Sca Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄCK, Lucas sbacken 2 S-427 36 Billdal / SE | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Börlin, Maria, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Börlin, Maria, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al ALBIHNS AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07769061.8 | 09.07.2007 | [2010/16] | WO2007SE50515 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009008790 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175820 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/471, A61F13/15, A61F13/494 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
A61F13/471 (EP,US);
A61F13/15804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | URIN AUFSAUGENDER BEUTEL FÜR MÄNNLICHE INKONTINENZ | [2010/16] | English: | URINE ABSORBENT POUCH FOR MALE INCONTINENCE | [2010/16] | French: | POCHE ABSORBANT L'URINE POUR INCONTINENCE MASCULINE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 12.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0861643 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 34; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9909924 (TANG GORDON [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 43, line 27 - page 47, line 8 * * page 50, line 23 - page 52, line 17; figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]WO9909924 (TANG GORDON [US]); | [A]US6569135 (MULA ANTHONY [US]); | [A]EP0997126 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0903131 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0861643 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]US2007142794 (BESTER KENNETH W JR [US], et al) |