EP2011246 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATION AND COMPENSATION OF RADIATED FEEDBACK COUPLING IN A HIGH GAIN REPEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies S.a.r.l. 296-298 Route de Longwy 1940 Luxembourg City / LU | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states P-Wave Holdings, LLC 10877 Wilshire Boulevard 18th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies, Inc. 1801 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAITHWAITE, Richard Neil 1677 N. Yurok Street Orange, CA 92867 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Modin, Jan Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07775931.4 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007US09744 | Priority number, date | US20060793873P | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 793873 P | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007124103 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2011246 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/15 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04B7/15578 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | H04B7/15, H04B7/14, H04B3/36 | ||
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04B7/15, H04B7/14 | ||
Former IPC [2009/02] | H04B3/36, H04B7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND KOMPENSATION VON AUSGESTRAHLTER RÜCKKOPPLUNG IN EINEM HOCHGEWINNVERSTÄRKER | [2009/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATION AND COMPENSATION OF RADIATED FEEDBACK COUPLING IN A HIGH GAIN REPEATER | [2009/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION ET DE COMPENSATION DE COUPLAGE DE RÉACTION RAYONNÉ DANS UN RÉPÉTEUR À GAIN ÉLEVÉ | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 16.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2014 | 30.04.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2003022626 (MIQUEL XAVIER BARBA [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,18,20 * paragraphs [0062] , [0068] , [0069]; figures 5,6,10,11 * [A] 11-17 [Y] 4 [I] 3,8,9,19; | [XAYI]EP0772310 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,10,18,20 * abstract * * page 9, lines 25-58 * [A] 11-17 [Y] 4 [I] 6-9,19; | [XAYI]US6889033 (BONGFELDT DAVID [CA]) [X] 1,3,5,10,20 * column 14, line 54 - column 16, line 44; figures 1-2 * [A] 11-17 [Y] 4 [I] 2,6-9,18,19; | [YA]US2002039383 (ZHU JUNJIE [SG], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * [A] 1-3,5-20; | [YA]US2005191961 (KUNIEDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1,5,6; claims 1-2 * [A] 1-3,5-20 | International search | [X]US2004166802 (MCKAY DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US6697603 (LOVINGGOOD BRECK W [US], et al); | [A]US5115514 (LESLIE SAMUEL A [US]) |