EP2142073 - COORDINATING IMAGE ACQUISITION AMONG MULTIPLE ENDOSCOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington Roosevelt Commons Building, 4311 11th Avenue N.E., Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105 / US | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTON, Richard, S. 25524 S.E. 28th Street Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | 02 /
KARASAWA, Satoshi 2-36-9 Maeno-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8639 / JP | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Bartle, Robin Jonathan WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Bartle, Robin Jonathan W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 07777018.8 | 11.05.2007 | [2010/02] | WO2007US11479 | Priority number, date | US20070801219 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: US 801219 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008136800 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142073 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/045, A61B5/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A61B1/00172 (EP,US);
A61B1/045 (EP,US);
A61B5/0062 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | KOORDINATION DER BILDERFASSUNG UNTER MEHREREN ENDOSKOPEN | [2010/02] | English: | COORDINATING IMAGE ACQUISITION AMONG MULTIPLE ENDOSCOPES | [2010/02] | French: | COORDINATION D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE PARMI PLUSIEURS ENDOSCOPES | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 15.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2011 | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2002062061 (KANEKO MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 15-20 * page 2, paragraph 52 - page 5, paragraph 94 * * figures 1,3-5,8,10 * [A] 21-25 [Y] 26-29; | [XA]WO2006106853 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 15-25 [A] 26-29; | EP1864606 [ ] (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [ ] * page 4, paragraph 23 - page 5, paragraph 31 * * figures 2,3 *; | [XA]US5178130 (KAIYA HARUHIKO [JP]) [X] 15-20 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 60 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 21-29; | [XA]US4821117 (SEKIGUCHI TADASHI [JP]) [X] 15-26 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 66 * * figure 1 * [A] 27-29; | [Y]US2005025368 (GLUKHOVSKY ARKADY [US]) [Y] 26-29 * page 2, paragraphs 17-21 * * page 5, paragraphs 45,46 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4768513 (SUZUKI SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 15-29 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 47 * * column 7, line 3 - column 9, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5315383 (YABE HISAO [JP], et al) [A] 15-29 * column 5, line 10 - column 11, line 54 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2006138238 |