EP2019647 - NOVEL HYDROPHILIC POLYMERS AS MEDICAL LUBRICANTS AND GELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trustees of Boston University One Sherborn Street Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRINSTAFF, Mark, W. 53 Beals Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
WATHIER, Michel 15 Braemore Road, Apt. 5 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/06] | 01 /
GRINSTAFF, Mark, W. 53 Beals Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | ||
02 /
WATHIER, Michel 1378 Beacon Street, Apt. 8 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | Hollywood, Jane Constance, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07777140.0 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US11888 | Priority number, date | US20060801751P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 801751 P | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007136738 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019647 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61K38/00, A61N1/00, A61K47/34, A61K47/48, A61L27/52, C08G61/08, // C08L65/00 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C08B37/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
C08G61/125 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1426 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3324 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3342 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/06] | A61F2/00, A61K38/00, A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE HYDROPHILE POLYMERE ALS MEDIZINISCHE GLEITMITTEL UND GELE | [2009/06] | English: | NOVEL HYDROPHILIC POLYMERS AS MEDICAL LUBRICANTS AND GELS | [2009/06] | French: | NOUVEAUX POLYMÈRES HYDROPHILES UTILISÉS EN TANT QUE GELS ET LUBRIFIANTS À USAGE MÉDICAL | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP12174827.1 / EP2543340 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19716312 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,9-16 * examples 1-22; claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [A]US2002141967 (WILLIAMS SIMON F [US], et al) [A] 1-2,9-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005097869 (CARDIOME PHARMA CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-2,9-16 * abstract * * page 10, line 1 - line 35 * * page 99, line 21 - page 103, line 19; examples 1-19; claims 1,6,8,19,20 *; | [X] - Stefan Meier, "Neue cycloaliphatische Polymere und Polymerdispersionen durch übergangsmetallkatalysierte Polymerisation cyclischer Olefine und polymeranaloge Reaktionen", Dissertation, (20030602), pages 89 - 140, URL: http://www.freidok.uni-freiburg.de/volltexte/706/pdf/Diss_Meier_Freidok.pdf, (20100316), XP002573296 [X] 1-2,9-16 * the whole document * | [X] - WALSH ELISABETH B ET AL, "Synthesis of novel hydrophilic biopolymers", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS. ACS NATIONAL MEETING, XX, XX, (20000820), vol. 220th, pages POLY - 319, XP009106943 [X] 1-2,9-16 * the whole document * | [X] - LADMIRAL V ET AL, "Synthetic glycopolymers: an overview", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (20040301), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 431 - 449, XP004488663 [X] 1-2,9-16 * figure 1 * * items 1.2-1.4, and 1.8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2003.10.019 | [X] - NOMURA K ET AL, "PREPARATION OF SUGAR-COATED HOMOPOLYMERS AND MULTIBLOCK ROMP COPOLYMERS", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960115), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 540 - 545, XP000545165 [X] 1-2,9-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma9512519 | [X] - CRAYMER JEANETTE F ET AL, "Emulsion polymerization of functionalized norbornenes and oxanorbornenes", POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20050101), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0032-3934, pages 884 - 885, XP009130745 [X] 1-2,9-16 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * table 1 * | International search | [Y]US4511559 (SZENDREI KALMAN [HU], et al); | [Y]US5676964 (DELLA VALLE FRANCESCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5827937 (ANGSTROM GERUP BENGT [SE]); | [Y]WO03000191 (DEPUY [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2005035588 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [Y] - BARROW ET AL., "The structure of a novel polysaccharide isolated from Zymomonas mobilis determined by nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 145, pages 173 - 179, XP008131407 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1984.tb08537.x | Examination | - BENEDICTO A D ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURAL STUDIES OF POLY(7-OXABICYCLO(2.2.1)HEPT-2-ENE) DERIVATIVES PREPARED FROM SELECTED RUTHENIUM CATALYSTS", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19921026), vol. 25, no. 22, doi:10.1021/MA00048A006, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 5893 - 5900, XP000315444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00048a006 |