EP2029684 - PRODUCT FOR TREATING VEHICLE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAMOND, Keri 6466 Rosemary Common Livermore, CA 94551 / US | 02 /
GATHMAN, Stephanie 3975 Tupelo Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Cheryl, H. 19 S. Brixham Dr. Rogers, AR 72758 / US | 04 /
SEROBIAN, Ashot, K. 105 Lees Place Martinez, CA 94553 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
DIAMOND, Keri 6466 Rosemary Common Livermore, CA 94551 / US | ||
02 /
GATHMAN, Stephanie 3975 Tupelo Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | |||
03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Cheryl, H. 2703 Corte Bandera Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | |||
04 /
SEROBIAN, Ashot, K. 105 Lees Place Martinez, CA 94553 / US | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Bailey, Lindsey Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Bailey, Lindsey Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07777418.0 | 05.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US13357 | Priority number, date | US20060422517 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 422517 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007146018 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029684 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09G1/12, C09D183/04 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
C09G1/12 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2009/27] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PRODUKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FAHRZEUGOBERFLÄCHEN | [2009/10] | English: | PRODUCT FOR TREATING VEHICLE SURFACES | [2009/10] | French: | PRODUIT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES DE VÉHICULES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 08.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 03.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4600436 (TRAVER FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * Formulation 4e; column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 31; claim 1 * * column 8, line 10 - column 8, line 14 *; | [XD]EP0473039 (DOW CORNING [US]) [XD] 1-15 * examples 1-6 *; | [X]US4657967 (KLOSOWSKI JEROME M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 7, line 8 - column 7, line 25; example 1 *; | [X]US4221688 (JOHNSON ROBERT D, et al) [X] 1-15 * example 1 * | by applicant | US5433890 | US6602379 | US6686301 | US5089253 | US4657967 | US4600436 | US4880557 | US5378271 | US5518533 |