19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
27.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
01.10.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
24.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
02.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
06.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
23.10.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
31.07.2009 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
13.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
13.03.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
19.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
16.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|