EP1981564 - ADJUSTING PH IN A METHOD OF SEPARATING WHOLE BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CaridianBCT, Inc. 10811 West Collins Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELT, Thomas 2745 Juilliard Street Boulder, Colorado 80305 / US | 02 /
PIHLSTEDT, Peter Vallahallavagen 16 SE-11422 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
GIBBS, Bruce 8425 Wright Street Arvada, Colorado 80005 / US | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07777680.5 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US61301 | Priority number, date | US20060766586P | 30.01.2006 Original published format: US 766586 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120962 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981564 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981564 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/38, A61M1/36 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
A61M1/3496 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3633 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
A61M1/0218 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/14 (KR);
A61M1/3672 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
A61M1/3698 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PH-WERT-ANPASSUNG BEI EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR VOLLBLUTTRENNUNG | [2008/43] | English: | ADJUSTING PH IN A METHOD OF SEPARATING WHOLE BLOOD | [2008/43] | French: | AJUSTEMENT DE PH AU COURS D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE SANG TOTAL | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09007122.6 / EP2092946 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 25.06.2009 | [2009/36] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | LV | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | IE | 30.01.2010 | LU | 30.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2010 | ||
LU | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3847738 (BRAKE J, et al) [A] * column 1, line 37 - line 43 * * column 4, line 40 - line 42 *; | [Y]US6277556 (GRODE GERALD A [US], et al) [Y] 3 * claim 1 *; | [YA]US2003148256 (PAYRAT JEAN-MARC [BE], et al) [Y] 16-18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0015] * [A] 11-14; | [A]US2003146170 (CORBIN FRANK [US], et al)[A] 1; | [XAYI]US2004104182 (HOLMES BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,15,20-23 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063]; figures 2-6; claim 15 * [A] 11 [Y] 3,16-18 [I] 5,6,9,10 |