EP2012847 - STENT WITH MOVABLE CROWN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular Inc. IP Legal Department 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, James 6174 Gabrielle Drive Windsor, California 95429 / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Zimmermann & Partner Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07780905.1 | 29.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US65502 | Priority number, date | US20060379161 | 18.04.2006 Original published format: US 379161 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007121066 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2012847 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/14, A61L31/04, A61F2/82, A61F2/86 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61L31/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | STENT MIT BEWEGLICHER KRONE | [2009/03] | English: | STENT WITH MOVABLE CROWN | [2009/03] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE À COURONNE MOBILE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2009 | 31.03.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2006005027 (CORDIS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9,11-15; | [Y]EP1645300 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [Y] 2-9,11-15 * page 2 *; | [A]US2005182474 (JONES RYAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2004102837 (BOYLE CHRISTOPHER T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |