EP2016750 - SIMPLIFIED DUAL MODE WIRELESS DEVICE AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive, SJC/10/2/1 San Jose CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Shze Chew 61 Bell Chime Irvine, California 92618 / US | 02 /
GUTMAN, Andrew M. 26 Saucito Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | 03 /
WILLIS, Edward Dean 3100 Independence Parkway 311-164 Plano, Texas 75075 / US | [2009/10] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
LEE, Shze Chew 881 Las Palmas Irvine, California 92602 / US | ||
02 /
GUTMAN, Andrew M. 26 Saucito Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | |||
03 /
WILLIS, Edward Dean 3100 Independence Parkway 311-164 Plano, Texas 75075 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2009/04] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07781811.0 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007US66514 | Priority number, date | US20060408764 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 408764 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007124279 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2016750 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016750 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, G06F21/35, G06F21/74 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
G06F21/74 (EP,US);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/065 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/04] | H04M1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR VEREINFACHTE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG DRAHTLOSER BIMODALER GERÄTE | [2009/04] | English: | SIMPLIFIED DUAL MODE WIRELESS DEVICE AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2009/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL BIMODE SIMPLIFIÉ | [2017/16] |
Former [2009/04] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL BIMODE SIMPLIFIE | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2007 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | GB | 18.04.2018 | IE | 18.04.2018 | LU | 18.04.2018 | MT | 18.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.04.2007 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1424810 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [I] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0029] * [A] 4-7,11,12; | [I]US2001048744 (KIMURA SHINYA [JP]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] *; | [E]WO2008021547 (AT & T MOBILITY II LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-3 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2005232209 (BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0023] * | [X] - "AT-WA7500 Dual Radio Wireless Access Point Next Generation Wireless Access Point Enterprise-class Features", (20041014), URL: http://www.alliedtelesis.com/media/datasheets/wa7500_ds.pdf, (20150122), XP055164237 [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2001048744 (KIMURA SHINYA [JP]); | [Y]US2005232209 (BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1424810 | US2001048744 |