EP2013668 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COORDINATING CONTROLLERS TO CONTROL A PAPER MACHINE OR OTHER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Junqiang 696 W. 45th Avenue, Apt 226 Vancouver, B.C. V5Z 2P8 / CA | 02 /
BACKSTROM, Johan, U. 1454 Mill Street North Vancouver, B.C. V7K 1V4 / CA | [2011/29] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
FAN, Junqiang 696 W. 45th Avenue, Apt 226 Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 2P8 / CA | ||
02 /
BACKSTROM, Johan, U. North Vancouver, B.C V7K 1V4 / CA | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
FAN, Junqiang 696 W. 45th Avenue, Apt 226 Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 2P8 / CA | ||
02 /
BACKSTROM, Johan, U. 521 St. Andrews Avenue, North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 4S7 / CA | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/10] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07783073.5 | 02.05.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US67984 | Priority number, date | US20060416876 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: US 416876 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007131011 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013668 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013668 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G05B11/32 (EP,US);
G05B13/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB [2009/23] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOORDINIERUNG VON KONTROLLEINHEITEN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER PAPIERMASCHINE ODER EINER ANDEREN MASCHINE | [2009/03] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COORDINATING CONTROLLERS TO CONTROL A PAPER MACHINE OR OTHER MACHINE | [2009/03] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COORDINATION D'UNITÉS DE COMMANDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UNE MACHINE À PAPIER OU UNE AUTRE MACHINE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 04.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002022892 (BERGOLD STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,11* abstract * |