EP2020139 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIGRATING BETWEEN TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Intellectual Property I, L.P. Building III, 1st Floor 6500 River Place Blvd Austin, TX 78730-1111 / US | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Marco 80 Red River Street 214 Austin, TX 78701 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Yi 10220 Cama Valley Cove Austin, TX 78739 / US | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07783704.5 | 14.05.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US68843 | Priority number, date | US20060420181 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: US 420181 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140106 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020139 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q7/38 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L67/148 (US);
H04L65/1083 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/403 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04M3/58 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (US);
H04L65/1104 (US);
H04L65/1106 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/25] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN ZWISCHEN ENDGERÄTEN | [2009/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIGRATING BETWEEN TERMINALS | [2009/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MIGRATIONS ENTRE TERMINAUX | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 29.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - WANG H J ET AL, "A signaling system using lightweight call sessions", INFOCOM 2000. NINETEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE TEL AVIV, ISRAEL 26-30 MARCH 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000326), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5880-5, pages 697 - 706, XP010376159 [X] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2000.832244 | [X] - OHTA K ET AL, "Adaptive terminal middleware for session mobility", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2002 IEEE WORKSHOP ON 9-11 DEC. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030519), ISBN 0-7803-7713-3, pages 394 - 399, XP010642403 [X] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - SHACHAM R ET AL, "The virtual device: expanding wireless communication services through service discovery and session mobility", WIRELESS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2005. (WIMOB'2005), IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, CANADA AUG. 22-24, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050822), ISBN 0-7803-9181-0, pages 73 - 81, XP010839733 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |