Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7709507 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2010 | B2 | US2007270498 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74718107 | 10.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5265528B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2013 | B2 | JP2009537561 | 29.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68929 | 15.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007253949B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2013 | B2 | AU2007253949 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68929 | 15.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2018364 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B1 | EP2018364 | 28.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68929 | 15.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0711971 | 10.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68929 | 15.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2652117 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68929 | 15.05.2007 | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007137029 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74744406 | 17.05.2006 |