EP2018364 - THERAPEUTIC FLUOROETHYL UREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOW, Ken 20 Tidal Surf Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | 02 /
FANG, Wenkui, K. 73 Peppermint Tree Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 03 /
CORPUZ, Evelyn, G. 1 Pollena Irvine, CA 92602 / US | 04 /
GIL, Daniel, W. 2541 Point Del Mar Corona Del Mar, CA 92625 / US | 05 /
GARST, Michael, E. 2627 Raqueta Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07783755.7 | 15.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007US68929 | Priority number, date | US20060747444P | 17.05.2006 Original published format: US 747444 P | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137029 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018364 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018364 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/24, C07D213/40, C07D307/52, C07D333/20, A61K31/17, A61K31/341, A61K31/381, A61K31/4402, A61K31/4406, A61K31/4409, A61P25/04 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
C07C275/24 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
C07D333/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE FLUORETHYL-HARNSTOFFE | [2009/05] | English: | THERAPEUTIC FLUOROETHYL UREAS | [2009/05] | French: | URÉES DE FLUOROÉTHYLE THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | IE | 15.05.2014 | LU | 15.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.05.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0068590 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,13-27 * abstract *; | [A]WO0178702 (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US]) [A] 1,13-27 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A] - BOYD R E, "ALPHA2-ADRENERGIC AGONISTS AS ANALGESIC AGENTS", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, GB, (2000), vol. 10, no. 11, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 1741 - 1748, XP001008886 [A] 1,13-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.10.11.1741 |