EP2032127 - TREATING PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS USING MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR M1 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theracos, Inc. 225 Cedar Hill Street, Suite 200 Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Theracos, Inc. 550 Del Rey Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-3528 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEED, Brian 2 Hawthorne Place Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
MECHANIC, Jordan 7137 Coronado Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2014/23] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
SEED, Brian 21 Fairway Drive, 2121 Derry, New Hampshire 03038 / US | ||
02 /
MECHANIC, Jordan 30 Newell Road, 17 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Cole, William Gwyn avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Cole, William Gwyn HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/11] | Cole, William Gwyn HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane GB-Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07784456.1 | 15.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US71356 | Priority number, date | US20060805066P | 16.06.2006 Original published format: US 805066 P | US20060829225P | 12.10.2006 Original published format: US 829225 P | US20070763145 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: US 763145 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007147123 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032127 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032127 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61K31/138, A61K31/15, A61K31/165, A61K31/343, A61K31/381, A61K31/4525, A61K31/55, A61K31/551, A61K31/5513, A61P25/18, A61K45/06 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/15 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/5513 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/15, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/381, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2009/11] | A61K31/00, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG PSYCHOLOGISCHER ERKRANKUNGEN MITTELS MUSCARINREZEPTOR-M1-ANTAGONISTEN | [2009/11] | English: | TREATING PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS USING MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR M1 ANTAGONISTS | [2009/11] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES PSYCHOLOGIQUES AU MOYEN D'ANTAGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR MUSCARINIQUE M1 | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 19.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12194224.7 / EP2666358 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2007 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3953430 (SAFIR SIDNEY ROBERT) [X] 1,5,12,13 * column 1, lines 5-15 * * column 4, lines 57,58 * * column 6, lines 24,25 * [Y] 1-15; | [PX]WO2006113485 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US], et al) [PX] 1,5,12,13 * claims 112,132,133,144 *; | [PX]WO2006127418 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [PX] 1-15 * page 2, lines 4-9 * * page 10, line 9 - page 14, line 15 ** page 22, lines 1-9 *; | [Y] - CHAU D T ET AL, "Nucleus accumbens muscarinic receptors in the control of behavioral depression: Antidepressant-like effects of local M1 antagonist in the porsolt swim test", NEUROSCIENCE, (20010614), vol. 104, no. 3, ISSN 0306-4522, pages 791 - 798, XP002550693 [Y] 1-15 * page 794; table 1 * * page 796, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0306-4522(01)00133-6 | International search | [X]US2004082653 (NONAKA SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005227998 (VOELKER KIRK [US]) | by applicant | US3660380 | US3743734 | US3953430 | US4168269 | US4172831 | US4381301 | US5140025 | US5296483 | US5312817 | US5324832 | US5445829 | US5472704 | US5672356 | US6080736 | US6150354 | US6310177 | US6312717 | US6319919 | US6379696 | US6403597 | US6465006 | US6482440 | US6512010 | US6517864 | US6524621 | US6528080 | US6537579 | US6541020 | US6544548 | US6548084 | US6562375 | US6565883 | US6569463 | US6589563 | US6589549 | US6596308 | US6599529 | US6607751 | US6613361 | US6613358 | US6624200 | US6635680 | US6638521 | US2004082653 | US2005227998 | - CHAU, D.T. ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2001), vol. 104, no. 3, pages 791 - 8 | - MIYAKAWA, T. ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2001), vol. 21, no. 14, pages 5239 - 50 | - ROGOZ, Z.; SKUZA, G.; SOWINSKA, H., POL. J. PHARMACOL. PHARM., (1981), vol. 31, pages 615 - 26 | - HAMMER, R.; KOSS, F.W., SCAND. J. GASTROENTEROL., (1979), vol. 14, no. 57, pages 1 - 6 | - BYMASTER, F.P. ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1993), vol. 267, no. 1, pages 16 - 24 | - MUNSON, P.J.; RODBARD, D., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, pages 220 - 39 | - BUCKLEY ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 35, pages 469 - 76 | - BOLDEN ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1992), vol. 260, pages 576 - 80 | - HAMMER, R.; KOSS, F.W.; SCAND. J., GASTROENTEROL., (1979), vol. 14, no. 57, pages 1 - 6 | - BYMASTER ET AL., CURR DRUG TARGETS CNS NEUROL DISORD, (2002), vol. 1, pages 163 - 181 | - SMOLDERS ET AL., J NEUROCHEM, (1997), vol. 68, pages 1942 - 1948 | - IZURIETA-SANCHEZ ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 399, pages 151 - 160 | - BERRIDGE; ROBINSON, BRAIN RES BRAIN RES REV, (1998), vol. 28, pages 309 - 369 | - CRESPO ET AL., JNEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 26, pages 6004 - 6010 | - DI CHIARA; IMPERATO, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5274 - 5278 | - HERNANDEZ; HOEBEL, LIFE SCI, (1988), vol. 42, pages 1705 - 1712 | - ZAHM; BROG, NEUROSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 50, pages 751 - 767 | - HOEBEL ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (1983), vol. 81, pages 15 8 - 163 | - RADA ET AL., PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (1996), vol. 53, pages 809 - 816 | - ACQUAS; DI CHIARA, JNEUROCHEM, (1992), vol. 58, pages 1620 - 1625 | - DIANA ET AL., JPHARMACOL EXP THER, (1995), vol. 272, pages 781 - 785 | - POTHOS ET AL., BRAIN RES, (1991), vol. 566, pages 348 - 350 | - RADA ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2001), vol. 157, pages 105 - 110 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., EUR J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 23, pages 219 - 228 | - FISEROVA ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (1999), vol. 142, pages 85 - 94 | - RADA ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 1133 - 1136 | - MARK ET AL., BRAIN RES, (1995), vol. 688, pages 184 - 188 | - RADA; HOEBEL, BRAIN RES, (2001), vol. 888, pages 60 - 65 | - RADA; HOEBEL, EUR JPHARMACOL, (2005), vol. 508, pages 131 - 138 | - RADA ET AL., PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (2004), vol. 79, pages 599 - 605 | - COLANTUONI ET AL., OBES RES, (2002), vol. 10, pages 478 - 488 | - EVELEIGH ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 35, pages 477 - 483 | - SCHUDT ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 165, pages 87 - 96 | - ELTZE, EUR J PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 180, pages 161 - 168 | - FEIFEL ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (1991), vol. 195, pages 115 - 123 | - KILIAN ET AL., AGENTS ACTIONS SUPPL, vol. 34, pages 131 - 147 | - NILSSON BM, J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 4023 - 4034 | - HUANG ET AL., DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (2003), vol. 29, page 79 | - PEARNCHOB ET AL., DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (2003), vol. 29, page 925 | - MAGGI ET AL., EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (2003), vol. 55, page 99 | - KHANVILKAR ET AL., DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (2002), vol. 228, page 601 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., INT. J. PHARM., (2001), vol. 216, page 9 | - STERU L ET AL., PYC/OP/ARMACOL, (1985), vol. 85, pages 367 - 70 | - STERU L ET AL., PROG NEURO-PSYCHOPHARMACOL & BIOL PSYCHIAT, (1987), vol. 11, pages 659 - 71 | - CROWLEY JJ ET AL., PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEH, (2004), vol. 78, no. 2, pages 269 - 74 |