EP2047023 - DEVICE FOR THE SUPERIMPOSITION OF COLOR PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peter Zimmer KEG Untere Sparchen 54 6330 Kufstein / AT | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMER, Peter Untere Sparchen 54 A-6330 Kufstein / AT | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [2009/16] | Hofinger, Stephan Wilhelm-Greilstrasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 07784583.2 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007AT00352 | Priority number, date | AT20060001288 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: AT 12882006 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011645 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047023 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047023 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
D06B11/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON FARBMUSTERN | [2009/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SUPERIMPOSITION OF COLOR PATTERNS | [2009/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER DES DESSINS EN COULEUR | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 29.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2007 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MT | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | IE | 18.07.2016 | LU | 18.07.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004038086 (TECNOFIL SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * page 6, line 8 - line 28 * * page 7, line 5 - line 26 *; | [X]WO0140565 (VERHAEGHE IND [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 19 *; | [X]GB2038242 (PILE FABRIC RESEARCH CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 30 - line 39 * |