EP2043764 - CO2 CAPTURE USING SOLAR THERMAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIBBERLEY, Louis 5a Park Road Garden Suburb, New South Wales 2289 / AU | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07784650.9 | 17.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007AU00994 | Priority number, date | AU20060903840 | 17.07.2006 Original published format: AU 2006903840 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009049 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043764 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/18, F24J2/34 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
F28D20/003 (EP,US);
B01D53/14 (KR);
B01D53/1425 (EP,US);
B01D53/1475 (EP,US);
B01D53/18 (KR);
F24S10/00 (EP,US);
B01D2256/22 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US);
Y02E70/30 (EP,US);
Y02P10/122 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFANGEN VON CO2 UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SOLARER WÄRMEENERGIE | [2009/15] | English: | CO2 CAPTURE USING SOLAR THERMAL ENERGY | [2009/15] | French: | CAPTURE DE CO2 À L'AIDE DE L'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE SOLAIRE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 31.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4420587 (SOLVAY DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 3,4,12,13 * claim 1 ** page 3, line 33 - line 43 *; | [IY] - NAITO H ET AL, "CO2 recovery from alkanol-amine solution using integrated stationary evacuated concentrators", JOURNAL DE PHYSIQUE IV, EDITIONS DE PHYSIQUE. LES ULIS CEDEX, FR, (19990101), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1155-4339, pages PR3 - 349, XP008121694 [I] 1,2,5-11,14-18 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 350, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 352, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3,4,12,13 | International search | [Y]US4995234 (KOOY RICHARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US5520894 (HEESINK ALBERTUS B M [NL], et al); | [Y]GB2336597 (ELF EXPLORATION PROD [FR]); | [Y]EP0768365 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]US6655150 (AASEN KNUT INGVAR [NO], et al) |