EP2057323 - SHEAR PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Construction Systems Australia Pty Ltd Suite 15, 74 Doncaster Road Balwyn North, Victoria 3104 / AU | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONNELL, Robert Urquhart 3/528 Tooronga Road Hawthorn East, Victoria 3123 / AU | 02 /
COUMAROS, Andrew 1 Ranleigh Rise Lower Templestowe, Victoria 3107 / AU | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Bloch, Gérard Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, Rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07784866.1 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007AU01244 | Priority number, date | AU20060904746 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: AU 2006904746 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025070 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057323 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/21 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
E04B1/41 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2009/41] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHERPLATTE | [2009/20] | English: | SHEAR PLATE | [2009/20] | French: | PLAQUE DE CISAILLEMENT | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 01.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6185897 (JOHNSON STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [A]US5402616 (KLEIN DAVID M [US]); | [A]US5222338 (HULL HAROLD L [US], et al); | [A]US6668506 (SNAUWAERT ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US2004040236 (ADAMS JAMES [US]); | [A]DE10060528 (IFF WEIMAR [DE]) |