Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2059375 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2012 | B1 | EP2059375 | 20.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CH00422 | 24.08.2007 | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE552089T | 15.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CH00422 | 24.08.2007 | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2059375T | 23.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CH00422 | 24.08.2007 | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2385409T | 24.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CH00422 | 24.08.2007 | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2059375T | 29.03.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CH00422 | 24.08.2007 | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 | EP07785112 | 24.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008028307 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH14462006 | 08.09.2006 |