17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
05.09.2014 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
10.01.2014 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
18.12.2013 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
25.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
15.10.2013 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
10.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
10.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
15.07.2011 |
Opposition withdrawn |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
14.01.2011 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
24.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
20.08.2010 |
Opposition filed |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
02.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
16.10.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
09.10.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.04.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
03.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2009 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.11.2008 |
Change - priority |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
12.11.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
12.11.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
18.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
18.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
11.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|