EP1958344 - SYSTEM FOR RATE-CONTROL OF AGGREGATE-RATE COMMUNICATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULTAN, Robert 211B Heritage Hills Drive Somers, New York 10589 / US | 02 /
GJESSING, Stein Setra Vei 12C N-0786 Oslo / NO | 03 /
ZHANG, Xuan Lanshan International Dept. 1-406, Heilongjiang RO. Nanjing, Jiangsu 210037 / CN | 04 /
DENG, Zhusheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LI, Xixiang Laiying Garden 9602 Shahexi Road Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 06 /
HE, Jianfei Huawei Service Centre Building Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/07] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
SULTAN, Robert 211B Heritage Hills Drive Somers, New York 10589 / US | ||
02 /
GJESSING, Stein Setra Vei 12C N-0786 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Xuan Lanshan International Dept. , 1-406, Heilongjiang RO. Nanjing, Jiangsu 210037 / CN | |||
04 /
DENG, Zhusheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Xixiang Laiying Garden 9602 Shahexi Road Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | |||
06 /
HE, Jianfei Huawei Service Centre Building Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
SULTAN, Robert 211B Heritage Hills Drive Somers, New York 10589 / US | ||
02 /
GJESSING, Stein Setra Vei 12C N-0786 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Xuan Lanshan International Dept. 1-406 Heilongjiang RO. Nanjing, Jiangsu 210037 / CN | |||
04 /
DENG, Zhusheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Xixiang Laiying Garden 9602 Shahexi Road Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | |||
06 /
HE, Jianfei Huawei Service Centre Building Kefa Road, Science-Based Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07785378.6 | 24.07.2007 | [2008/34] | WO2007CN70350 | Priority number, date | US20060820202P | 24.07.2006 Original published format: US 820202 P | US20070622646 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: US 622646 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/34] | US20070820202P | 24.07.2007 | |
US20070622646 | 12.01.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014712 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958344 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958344 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1958344 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04L12/26, H04L12/701, H04L12/801, H04L12/813, H04L12/825 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L47/13 (EP,US);
H04L47/20 (EP,US);
H04L47/25 (EP,US);
H04L47/263 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | H04B7/005, H04L12/56, H04L12/26 | ||
Former IPC [2008/34] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR RATENSTEUERUNG VON KOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTEN MIT AGGREGIERTEN RATEN | [2008/34] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RATE-CONTROL OF AGGREGATE-RATE COMMUNICATION SERVICES | [2008/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À UNE COMMANDE DE TAUX DE SERVICES DE COMMUNICATION DE TAUX AGRÉGÉS | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2010
04.07.2011
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Burchardi, Thomas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2010
04.07.2011
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Burchardi, Thomas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2010/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Burchardi, Thomas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 24.09.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.07.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.12.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | IT | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | MT | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IE | 24.07.2010 | LU | 24.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
TR | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
LU | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5857147 (GARDNER WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1 - column 6; figure 5 * [A] 19-32; | [A]US2003165146 (SULTAN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-32* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *; | [XA]US2006098672 (SCHZUKIN GOLAN [IL], et al) [X] 1-31 [A] 32 | International search | [A]US5857147 (GARDNER WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US2003133415 (KIM TAI-SUK [KR], et al); | [A]WO2005013513 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]CN1585504 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |