04.01.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
18.09.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
16.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
09.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
08.05.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
06.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|