EP2044482 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF SPECTACLE LENS IN RELATION TO A SPECTACLE FRAME, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Isartalstrasse 43 80469 München / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESSNER, Rainer Allersbergerstrasse 38 91154 Roth / DE | 02 /
UTTENWEILER, Dietmar Walchstadter Str. 25 82057 Icking / DE | 03 /
WELK, Andrea Otkerstr. 7 81547 München / DE | 04 /
ALTHEIMER, Helmut An der Halde 2 87650 Baisweil-Lauchdorf / DE | 05 /
MÜLLER, Werner Waldstrasse 17 75443 Ötisheim / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
SESSNER, Rainer Allersbergerstrasse 38 91154 Roth / DE | ||
02 /
UTTENWEILER, Dietmar Peissenbergstrasse 1 81547 München / DE | |||
03 /
WELK, Andrea Otkerstr. 7 81547 München / DE | |||
04 /
ALTHEIMER, Helmut An der Halde 2 87650 Baisweil-Lauchdorf / DE | |||
05 /
MÜLLER, Werner Waldstrasse 17 75443 Ötisheim / DE | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786131.8 | 17.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP06337 | Priority number, date | DE20061033490 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006033490 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009423 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044482 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER POSITION EINES BRILLENGLASES RELATIV ZU EINER BRILLENFASSUNG, COMPUTERPROGRAMMVORRICHTUNG | [2009/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF SPECTACLE LENS IN RELATION TO A SPECTACLE FRAME, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM DEVICE | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE POSITION D'UN VERRE DE LUNETTES PAR RAPPORT À UNE MONTURE DE LUNETTES, DISPOSITIF À PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 14.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]DE102005003699 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-17 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-9 *; | [XA]WO2005071468 (OPHTHONIX INC [US]; WARDEN LAURENCE [US]; DREHER ANDREAS W [US]; MURPH) [X] 1-8,10,12-17 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1-18 * [A] 9,11; | [XA]DE10007705 (KEUNE THOMAS [DE]; RETTINGHAUS EGBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12,13,17 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-6 * [A] 3,6-9,11,14-16; | [X]US6286957 (LIVNAT AMI [IL]) [X] 1-8,10,12-17 * column 5, line 6 - column 8, line 58 * * column 9, line 28 - column 14, line 30; figures 4-9D *; | [X] - "IMPRESSIONIST - DAS 4-IN-1 INTEGRIERTE SERVICE-TERMINAL VON RODENSTOCK", DEUTSCHE OPTIKER ZEITUNG, XX, DE, (200601), pages 56 - 61, XP000962763 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - MUFF B, "DIE BRILLE AUS DEM COMPUTER", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, EDITION COLIBRI AG., WABERN, CH, (19881104), vol. 80, no. 45, ISSN 1023-0823, pages 52 - 53, XP000098546 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |