EP2052006 - CONJUGATED POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTE, Niels Frankfurter Strasse 69 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
SCHEURICH, René Peter Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 03 /
PAN, Junyou Sigmund-Freud-Strasse 105 60435 Frankfurt / DE | [2009/18] | Application number, filing date | 07786157.3 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007EP06383 | Priority number, date | DE20061038683 | 17.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006038683 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008019744 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052006 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052006 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/00, C08G61/02, C08G61/10, C08G61/12, C08G83/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
C08G61/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G61/12 (KR);
C08G61/00 (KR);
C08G83/00 (KR);
C08G83/002 (EP,US);
C08G83/005 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/145 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1466 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1475 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTE POLYMERE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2009/18] | English: | CONJUGATED POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE | [2009/18] | French: | POLYMÈRES CONJUGUÉS, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2007 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | AT | 18.07.2013 | IE | 18.07.2013 | LU | 18.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | FR | 12.08.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
AT | 18.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 12.08.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
AT | 18.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 12.08.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
AT | 18.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 12.08.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 12.08.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 12.08.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1074600 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0112]; example -; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2004062930 (ROBERTS RALPH R [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0224]; example -; claims 1-38 *; | [X]US2004214036 (BENTSEN JAMES G [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0275]; example -; claims 1-51 *; | [X]WO2005014689 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 5 - page 36, line 33; example -; claims 1-36 *; | [X]WO2005030827 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 5 - page 20, line 41; example -; claims 1-32 *; | [X]DE10357317 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0050]; example -; claims 1-24 *; | [X]WO2005078002 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005104264 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 5 - page 23, line 22; example -; claims 1-32 *; | [X]EP1717258 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0087]; example -; claims 1-11 *; | [X] - FRANK UCKERT, "Neue l sliche Poly(para-phenylen)-Derivate mit überbrückten Biphenyl-U", DISSERTATION ZUR ERLANGUNG DES GRADES DOKTOR DER NATURWISSENSCHAFTEN IM FACHBEREICH CHEMIE UND PHARMAZIE DER JOHANNES GUTENBERG-UNIVERSITAET IN MAINZ, (1998), pages 1 - 210, XP002306981 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0046321 | WO02077060 | WO03020790 |