17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
14.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
06.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
10.05.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
30.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
12.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2009 |
First examination report |
|
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
27.03.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
14.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|