Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010227974 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP06383 | 18.07.2007 | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010501030 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP06383 | 18.07.2007 | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2052006 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2013 | B1 | EP2052006 | 29.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP06383 | 18.07.2007 | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008019744 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090040390 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101511902 | 19.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006038683 | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200831555 | 01.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006038683 | 17.08.2006 |