EP2047313 - METHOD FOR LASER SCANNING MICROSCOPY AND BEAM COMBINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | For all designated states Cube Optics AG Robert-Koch-Strasse 30 55129 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH Carl Zeiss Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states Cube Optics AG Robert-Koch-Strasse 30 55129 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states Cube Optics AG Robert-Koch-Strasse 30 55129 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACHOLIK, Jörg Am Wiesenbach 18 07751 Kunitz / DE | 02 /
HUHSE, Dieter Stindestrasse 27 12167 Berlin / DE | 03 /
PAATZSCH, Thomas Stadionerhof Strasse 1 55116 Mainz / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH Zentralbereich Recht und Patente Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH, Zentralbereich Recht und Patente, Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Hampe, Holger C/o Carl Zeiss AG Standort Jena Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786280.3 | 24.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007EP06549 | Priority number, date | DE20061034909 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006034909 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012057 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047313 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
G02B21/002 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LASER-SCANNING-MIKROSKOPIE UND STRAHLVEREINIGER | [2009/16] | English: | METHOD FOR LASER SCANNING MICROSCOPY AND BEAM COMBINER | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MICROSCOPIE À BALAYAGE LASER ET CONCENTRATEUR DE FAISCEAUX | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005249457 (SEYFRIED VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0016] - [0020] - [0034] - [0043] * * claim 6 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2002131049 (SCHMITT JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0029] , [0030] * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]DE102004030669 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | Examination | DE19633185 | US2001028031 | US2006017001 |