EP2047565 - SLOT ANTENNA AND METHOD FOR RFID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepperl + Fuchs GmbH Königsberger Allee 87 68307 Mannheim / DE | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Stefan Rosenheckenstr. 41 67294 Mauchenheim / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786308.2 | 24.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007EP06582 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009012796 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047565 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047565 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q1/22, H01Q23/00, H01Q3/36, H01Q21/24 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2216 (EP,US);
H01Q21/245 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2010/12] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLITZANTENNE UND VERFAHREN ZUR RFID | [2009/16] | English: | SLOT ANTENNA AND METHOD FOR RFID | [2009/16] | French: | ANTENNE À FENTES ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE (RFID) | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 09.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0149922 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]) [A] 3,4,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0669672 (ASCOM BUSINESS SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5940041 (KOYAMA SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US5955998 (ROBERTS ROGER G [US], et al) [A] 12 * abstract ** column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - TANAKA T ET AL, "CIRCULARLY POLARIZED PRINTED ANTENNA COMBINING SLOTS AND PATCH", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (200703), vol. E90B, no. 3, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 621 - 629, XP001541881 [A] 2,4,13 * paragraph [02.2]; figures 4,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/e90-b.3.621 |