EP2044430 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING THE YARN QUALITY AND/OR SPOOL QUALITY OF A RUNNING THREAD BASED ON LASER-DOPPLER ANEMOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViEnCo GmbH Bonnenbroicherstrasse 11-15 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Hochschule Niederrhein Reinarzstrasse 49 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
For all designated states Vienco GmbH Bonnenbroicher Str. 11-15 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANNS, Ferdinand, Josef In Gerderhahn 15 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 02 /
KOHNS, Peter Honnefer Strasse 105 53179 Bonn / DE | 03 /
LINDEN, Martin Johannes-Wirtz-Str. 31 47877 Willich-Neersen / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
HERMANNS, Ferdinand, Josef In Gerderhahn 15 41812 Erkelenz / DE | ||
02 /
KOHNS, Peter Honnefer Strasse 105 53179 Bonn / DE | |||
03 /
LINDEN, Martin Hochfelder Str. 105 47809 Krefeld / DE | Representative(s) | Schrooten, Rolf BPSH Schrooten Haber Remus Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Grafenberger Allee 277-287, Eingang A 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Schrooten, Rolf BPSH Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Mörsenbroicher Weg 191 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786359.5 | 26.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP06643 | Priority number, date | DE20061035251 | 26.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006035251 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008012093 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2044430 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/36, G01P3/36, B65H61/00, B65H63/00, B65H63/08, B65H63/032 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
B65H59/40 (EP);
B65H61/005 (EP);
B65H63/00 (EP);
B65H63/003 (EP);
B65H63/0324 (EP);
B65H63/082 (EP);
G01N21/8915 (EP);
G01N33/365 (EP);
G01P3/366 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GARNQUALITÄT UND/ODER SPULENQUALITÄT EINES LAUFENDEN FADENS AUF BASIS DER LASER-DOPPLER-ANEMOMETRIE | [2009/15] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING THE YARN QUALITY AND/OR SPOOL QUALITY OF A RUNNING THREAD BASED ON LASER-DOPPLER ANEMOMETRY | [2009/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR DÉTERMINER LA QUALITÉ DU FIL ET/OU LA QUALITÉ DE BOBINE D'UN FIL CONTINU À L'AIDE D'ANÉMOMETRIE LASER DOPPLER | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DAX]DE10342383 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * paragraph [0043]; figure -; claim - * [X] 4,5,27-30; | [E]WO2007112980 (NIEDERRHEIN HOCHSCHULE [DE], et al) [E] 30 * claims 1,9,19 *; | [A]US5615014 (OKUDA KAZUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19824078 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [AX]US4334779 (DOMEY JACQUES, et al) [A] 1,27,28 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 25; figure - * [X] 30; | [AX]US3953128 (HOLLY SANDOR) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 11 - line 19 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 26 * * column 8, line 44 - line 61; claims 1,109 * [X] 30; | [A]DE19625511 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 4,18-20 * column 1, lines 19-25,30-35,46-54 * * column 2, lines 1-9 * * column 3, line 28 - line 37 * * column 5, line 14 - line 26; claim - *; | [A]US5636803 (ASCHMANN ALFRED [CH], et al) [A] 4,5,8,10,11,13,18-20 * column 1, lines 37-41 * * column 8, lines 4-28 *; | [DA]DE4225842 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [DA] 4,21 * column 6, lines 17-27 *; | [A]EP0457450 (RIETER SCRAGG LTD [GB]) [A] 4,5,8,9 * page 2, lines 18-32 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 57; figure - *; | [A]EP0790208 (IRO AB [SE]) [A] 14,15 * column 1, lines 21-23 *; | [A]WO9425869 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE], et al) [A] 7 * page 2, lines 4-7 * * page 4, lines 15-22 * * page 5, lines 1-6 * | by applicant | WO2007112980 | EP0457450 | DE10342383 |