17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
07.12.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
10.04.2012 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
27.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2011 |
First examination report |
|
22.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
20.03.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
14.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|