Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8292059 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2011220457 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37601809 | 22.04.2009 | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | US201113116075 | 26.05.2011 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8292058 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2011220456 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113116070 | 26.05.2011 | US37601809 | 22.04.2009 | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8286778 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2009308712 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5461182B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B2 | JP2009545501 | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2471737 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | EP07786388 | 27.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2471736 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | EP07786388 | 27.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2049428 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2013 | B1 | EP2049428 | 22.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101500927 | 05.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006036353 | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2402824T | 09.05.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2049428T | 28.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | EP07786388 | 27.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | WO2007EP06676 | 27.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008014938 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | A8 | WO2008014938 | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5996757B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2016 | B2 | JP2016027993 | 25.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013063854 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102249141B | 27.03.2013 | B | CN102249141 | 23.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2412896 | 27.02.2011 | C2 | RU2009107222 | 10.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007034628 | 23.07.2007 | DE102006036353 | 02.08.2006 | Type | Divisional application | EP2471736 | EP2471737 |