EP2049428 - ESCALATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ketten-Wulf Betriebs-GmbH Zum Hohenstein 15 59889 Eslohe-Kückelheim / DE | [2013/02] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Ketten Wulf Betriebs-GmbH Zum Hohenstein 15 59889 Eslohe-Kückelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROBBEL, Burkhard Hochstrasse 28 57392 Schmallenberg / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Brune, Axel, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Brune, Axel, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Brune, Axel, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786388.4 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP06676 | Priority number, date | DE20061036353 | 02.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036353 | DE20071034628 | 23.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007034628 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014938 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049428 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049428 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/02 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
B66B23/022 (EP,US);
B66B23/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRTREPPE | [2009/17] | English: | ESCALATOR | [2009/17] | French: | ESCALIER MÉCANIQUE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12162122.1 / EP2471736 | EP12162123.9 / EP2471737 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2007 | CY | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | IE | 27.07.2013 | LU | 27.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | DK | 09.01.2013 | |
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 09.01.2013 | |
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4498890 (SUTHERLAND GEORGE H [US]) [X] 1,3-16 * abstract *; | [XA]GB2243430 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-16 * abstract * [A] 2,3; | [XA]DE10218374 (KONE CORP [FI]) [X] 1,4-16 * abstract *[A] 2,3; | [XA]WO2005090221 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-16 * abstract * [A] 2 | by applicant | WO03036129 | EP1344740 | WO2005090221 | EP1728755 |