EP2170179 - CARBON SHAFTED REAMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Trauma GmbH Prof.-Küntscher-Str. 1-5 24232 Schönkirchen/Kiel / DE | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMIROV, Thomas Heikendorfer Weg 50 24149 Kiel / DE | 02 /
WIELAND, Manfred Berchtesgadenerstr. 24 24146 Kiel / DE | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Schmitz, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786467.6 | 31.07.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007EP06771 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009015672 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170179 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170179 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/164 (EP,US);
B23D77/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/1631 (EP,US);
B23D2277/02 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FRÄSVORRICHTUNG MIT KOHLENSTOFFSCHAFT | [2010/14] | English: | CARBON SHAFTED REAMING DEVICE | [2010/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALÉSAGE À TIGE DE CARBONE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2015 | 21.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | IE | 31.07.2015 | LU | 31.07.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 31.07.2007 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006046789 (VISION INNO TECH CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,12,13,15,17-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0018] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4751922 (DIPIETROPOLO AL [US]) [X] 1,2,12-15,17,18 * abstract * * column 4, line 36 - line 68; claim 1 * [Y] 3-8,10,16; | [X]US5488761 (LEONE RONALD P [US]) [X] 1,12-15 * column 3, line 12 - line 15 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 25 - line 31 *; | [X]US2005043739 (SULLIVAN ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-15,17-19 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] , [0022] - [0024]; figure . *; | [X]US2007015107 (MANNSCHEDEL WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0018] , [0019] *; | [YA]US3751176 (VON HOLLEN J) [Y] 3-8,10 * column 7, line 58 - line 64; figures 4,6,8; claim 6 * [A] 19; | [Y]US6656195 (PETERS GARY [US], et al) [Y] 16 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 17; figures 8,10; claim 1 * | Examination | US2006085004 | US5116172 | by applicant | US2007015107 | CH668690 | WO2006046789 | US4751922 |