EP2035381 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF STERICALLY HINDERED NITROXYL ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNING, Kai-Uwe Bienenstrasse 6 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 02 /
FISCHER, Walter Vogesenstrasse 77 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 03 /
BASBAS, Abdel-Ilah Häsingerstrasse 30 CH-4055 Basel / CH | 04 /
DICHTL, Alexander Adlergässchen 6 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07786819.8 | 25.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP56292 | Priority number, date | EP20060116619 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06116619 | EP20070102895 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: EP 07102895 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008003602 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2035381 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035381 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/94, C07B43/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
C07D211/94 (EP,KR,US);
C07B43/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07B63/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG STERISCH GEHINDERTER NITROXYLETHER | [2009/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF STERICALLY HINDERED NITROXYL ETHERS | [2009/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉTHERS DE NITROXYLE STÉRIQUEMENT ENCOMBRÉS | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | MT | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | IE | 25.06.2011 | LU | 25.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 25.06.2011 | ||
LU | 25.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 25.06.2011 | ||
LU | 25.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 25.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 25.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4921962 (GALBO JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, lines 36-45 *; | [X]EP0389419 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 17* Formula (I);;; claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0569334 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, lines 26-54 * * Examples,; page 3, lines 31-39 *; | [A]DE10008367 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * Examples,; page 30, line 61 - page 31, line 11; claim 14 *; | [A]WO0192228 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 2, lines 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]WO03045919 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 17 * example 19 *; | [AX]WO2005005388 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 8; claim 1 * * page 8, lines 15-28 * * Formula (Ib);; page 1, lines 3-8 * * page 8, lines 4-9 * [X] 17; | [AX]WO2005090307 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * Examples,; page 1, lines 22-32; claims 1,8-10 * * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 7 * * Formula (IIIa), (A),; page 3, lines 15-19; examples 3,4,6,7,14 * * page 21, line 30 - page 22, line 2 * [X] 17; | [A] - PATRICIA CARLONI, ROBERTO VIANELLI, LUCEDIO GRECI, "Reactions of an indolinonic nitroxide with superoxide radical anion in the presence of alkylhalides. Unexpected formation of a reduced transport product", J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM., (2003), vol. 40, pages 459 - 464, XP002380865 [A] 1-16 * page 462, column LEFT, lines 3-21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570400309 | [A] - MARIUS G. IVAN, J. C. SCAIANO, "A new approach for the detection of carbon-centered radicals in enzymatic processes using prefluorescent probes", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 416 - 417, XP002456429 [A] 1-16 * Schemes 1, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(2003)078<0416:ANAFTD>2.0.CO;2 | [A] - DEREK H. R. BARTON, BEATRICE M. CHABOT, BIN HU, "The functionalization of saturated hydrocarbons. Part 34. A study on the mechanisn of TEMPO trapping in GIF-type systems", TETRAHEDRON, (1996), vol. 52, no. 31, pages 10301 - 10312, XP004104017 [A] 1-16 * Scheme 1,;; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(96)00565-0 | [A] - TAN REN, YOU-CHENG LIU, QING-XIANG GUO, "Selective oxyfunctionalization of ketones using 1-oxopiperidinium salt", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1996), vol. 69, pages 2935 - 2941, XP002084451 [A] 1-16 * Scheme 2,;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.69.2935 | [A] - CARL G. JOHNSON, SIGALIT CARON, NEIL V. BLOUGH, "Combined liquid chromatography/mass spectrometry of the radical adducts of a fluorescamine-derivatized nitroxide", ANAL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, pages 867 - 872, XP002425023 [A] 1-16 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac951006n | [A] - TSUTOMU INOKUCHI, KEIICHI NAKAGAWA, SIGERU TORII, "One-pot conversion of primary alcohols to alpha-oxygenated alkanals with TEMPO in combination with molecular oxygen and ruthenium complex", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1995), vol. 36, no. 18, pages 3223 - 3226, XP004028231 [A] 1-16 * Page 3224, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)00519-I | [X] - JOSEPH E. BABIARZ, GLEN T. CUNKLE, ANTHONY D. DEBELLIS, DAVID EVELAND, STEPHEN D. PASTOR, SAI P. SHUM, "The thermal reaction of sterically hindered nitroxyl radicals with allylic and benzylic substrates: Experimental and computational evidence for divergent mechanisms", J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, pages 6831 - 6834, XP002456581 [X] 17 * compound 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo020426r |