EP2040681 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Liverpool The Foundation Building 765 Brownlow Hill Liverpool, L69 7ZX / GB | [2017/23] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Iota NanoSolutions Limited 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/16] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Iota NanoSolutions Limited 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCALF, David, John 36 Sandon Crescent Little Neston Wirral CH64 0TU / GB | 02 /
ELPHICK, Andrew, James 9 Bolsover Close Long Hanborough Oxford OX29 8RA / GB | 03 /
FOSTER, Alison, Jayne 74 Village Road Higher Bebington Wirral Merseyside / GB | 04 /
LONG, James 28 Palm Grove Oxton Wirral CH43 1TF / GB | 05 /
RANNARD, Steven, Paul Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 06 /
WANG, Dong IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool Merseyside L69 7ZB / GB | [2017/32] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
DUNCALF, David, John 36 Sandon Crescent Little Neston Wirral CH64 0TU / GB | ||
02 /
ELPHICK, Andrew, James 9 Bolsover Close Long Hanborough Oxford OX29 8RA / GB | |||
03 /
FOSTER, Alison, Jayne 74 Village Road Higher Bebington Wirral Merseyside / GB | |||
04 /
LONG, James 28 Palm Grove Oxton Wirral CH43 1TF / GB | |||
05 /
RANNARD, Steven, Paul Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | |||
06 /
WANG, Dong IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool Merseyside L69 7ZB / GB | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/02] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07786933.7 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP56564 | Priority number, date | GB20060013925 | 13.07.2006 Original published format: GB 0613925 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006716 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040681 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040681 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K31/496 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N43/54, A01N53/00, A01N31/16, A01N37/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2009/14] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2009/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES AMÉLIORÉES | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 03.06.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/10] | 02.05.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/10] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2007 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.06.2007 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004028505 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * table 2 * * page 22, line 7 - line 19 * * claim 13 *; | [X]WO2004064834 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO2005014043 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 3 *; | [A] - CHRISTENSEN K L ET AL, "PREPARATION OF REDISPERSIBLE DRY EMULSIONS BY SPRAY DRYING", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010116), vol. 212, no. 2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 187 - 194, XP009055444 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(00)00596-2 |