EP2057385 - SELF-BOOSTING ELECTROMECHANICAL FRICTION BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Chi-Thuan Tubizer Str 35 70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Dirk In Den Weinbergen 26 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
VOLLERT, Herbert Oberriexinger Weg 75 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 04 /
NAGEL, Willi Bittenfelder Str. 31 71686 Remseck/Hochdorf / DE | 05 /
FOITZIK, Bertram Ilsfelder Str. 28/1 74360 Ilsfeld / DE | 06 /
GOETZELMANN, Bernd Eltinger Str. 12 71063 Sindelfingen / DE | [2009/20] | Application number, filing date | 07787304.0 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007EP57029 | Priority number, date | DE20061039984 | 25.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006039984 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022844 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057385 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057385 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/18 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D2121/24 (EP,US);
F16D2125/24 (EP,US);
F16D2127/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/39] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTVERSTÄRKENDE ELEKTROMECHANISCHE REIBUNGSBREMSE | [2009/20] | English: | SELF-BOOSTING ELECTROMECHANICAL FRICTION BRAKE | [2009/20] | French: | FREIN A FRICTION ELECTROMECANIQUE A AUTO-AMPLIFICATION | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 26.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/34] | IT | 10.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005064195 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 15 * * page 12, line 3 - line 22; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]DE10324424 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015]; figure . *; | [A]US6119822 (BALDWIN STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - line 49; figure 1 * |